Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 231 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 231 Week
» 11778 Month
» 411460 Year
» 488047 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 816   06/1899
LMS 17554   01/01/1923
BR 57554   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 06/1899
Withdrawal During 06/1960
Scrapping During 07/1960
Service Life 61 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31A St Rollox (Balornock) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
65D Dawsholm 4w/e 13/06/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   13/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17554    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57554    
13/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 57554    
10/03/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit.: Around the works. - Cemetery - boiler and/or firebox only.   Link
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery" SLS 7/1962 Link

prev prev