Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 231 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 231 Week
» 11778 Month
» 411460 Year
» 488047 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 819   06/1899
LMS 17557   01/01/1923
BR 57557   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 06/1899
Withdrawal During 09/1962
Service Life 63 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31A St Rollox (Balornock) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   02/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17557    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Rollox (Balornock) (31A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57557    
18/04/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Being cut up. SLS 5/1962 Link
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery" SLS 7/1962 Link
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57557    

prev prev