Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 221 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 221 Week
» 11768 Month
» 411450 Year
» 488037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 821   07/1899
LMS 17559   01/01/1923
BR 57559   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 07/1899
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Scrapping During 04/1962
Service Life 62 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
28B Dalry Road 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   02/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17559    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dalry Road (28B)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57559    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57559    
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery" SLS 7/1962 Link

prev prev