Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 822   07/1899
LMS 17560   01/01/1923
BR 57560 w/e 02/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 07/1899
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Scrapping During 04/1962
Service Life 62 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Corkerhill 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 06/07/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 13/07/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   02/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17560    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57560    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57560    
18/04/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - Awaiting cutting up. SLS 5/1962 Link
02/06/1962 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: Around the works - In the "Cemetery" SLS 7/1962 Link

prev prev