Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 598 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14004 Week
» 67020 Month
» 186547 Year
» 3213400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7088 |
12/1939 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12011 |
29/01/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,126.00 |
To Service |
12/1939 |
Withdrawn |
12/03/1966 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1966 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Derby) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1939 |
8C |
|
Speke Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5B |
|
Crewe South |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/03/1966 |
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/1939 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7088 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12011 |
|
|
22/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12011 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|