Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 14 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6229 Week
» 17934 Month
» 349423 Year
» 426010 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 824   07/1899
LMS 17562   01/01/1923
BR 57562   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 07/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 21/05/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Corkerhill 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67B Hurlford 4w/e 21/12/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 21/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   w/e 21/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17562    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57562    
21/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
21/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57562    

prev prev