Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 825   08/1899
LMS 17563   01/01/1923
BR 57563   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 08/1899
Withdrawal Mon 11/12/1961
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12G Dumfries 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 19/05/1951
66A Polmadie 8w/e 19/04/1952
   Withdrawn 11/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 22/03/1952
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   11/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17563    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dumfries (12G)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57563    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
11/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57563    

prev prev