Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 169 Today
» 1071 Yesterday
» 169 Week
» 19633 Month
» 419315 Year
» 495902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 826   08/1899
LMS 17564   01/01/1923
BR 57564   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 08/1899
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27A Polmadie 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 27A Polmadie w/e 13/12/1947
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   02/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17564    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57564    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57564    

prev prev