Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 12 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6858 Week
» 18405 Month
» 418087 Year
» 494674 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 828   08/1899
LMS 17566   01/01/1923
BR 57566   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 08/1899
Withdrawal During 08/1963
Service Life 64 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Corkerhill 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67D Ardrossan 8w/e 31/08/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 07/09/1957
WDN   08/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17566    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57566    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 57566    

prev prev