Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 5 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6851 Week
» 18398 Month
» 418080 Year
» 494667 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 830   12/1899
LMS 17568   01/01/1923
BR 57568   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 12/1899
Withdrawal During 11/1963
Scrapping During 12/1963
Service Life 63 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
29C Dundee West 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 18/02/1956
68D Beattock 4w/e 12/05/1956
66B Motherwell 4w/e 24/11/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 3w/e 21/01/1956
ALLOC 68D Beattock 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 7w/e 29/12/1962
WDN   29/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17568    
01/01/1948 Allocation      
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57568    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
12/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Beattock (68D)    
24/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 57568    

prev prev