Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 12 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6858 Week
» 18405 Month
» 418087 Year
» 494674 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 833   12/1899
LMS 17571   01/01/1923
BR 57571   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 12/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/04/1962
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 62 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30B Hurlford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
63D Oban 4w/e 05/07/1958
66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/10/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 30/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 63D Oban 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 2w/e 21/10/1961
WDN   30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17571    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hurlford (30B)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57571    
05/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oban (63D)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
30/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57571    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle    

prev prev