Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 753 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6358 Week
» 17905 Month
» 417587 Year
» 494174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 837   12/1899
LMS 17575   01/01/1923
BR 57575   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 12/1899
Withdrawal During 10/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 59 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Corkerhill 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
60A Inverness 4w/e 28/09/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   29/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17575    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57575    
28/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 57575    

prev prev