Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 838   12/1899
LMS 17576   01/01/1923
BR 57576   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 12/1899
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 61 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
28B Dalry Road 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
63D Oban 8w/e 09/07/1955
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 02/09/1955
63B Stirling 4w/e 11/04/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 63D Oban 4w/e 11/06/1955
LOAN 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 03/09/1955
WDN   02/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17576    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dalry Road (28B)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57576    
09/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Oban (63D)    
02/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stirling (63B)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57576    
03/06/1962 Sightings At Bo'ness: In store SLS 7/1962 Link

prev prev