Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 839   04/1900
LMS 17577   01/01/1923
BR 57577   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 04/1900
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/07/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30C Ardrossan 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67B Hurlford 4w/e 08/06/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 30/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67B Hurlford 4w/e 15/06/1957
WDN   w/e 30/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17577    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardrossan (30C)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57577    
08/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
30/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57577    

prev prev