Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 11 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6857 Week
» 18404 Month
» 418086 Year
» 494673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 841   04/1900
LMS 17579   01/01/1923
BR 57579   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 04/1900
Withdrawal Mon 27/11/1961
Scrapping During 02/1963
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30C Ardrossan 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 14/06/1952
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 28/09/1957
   Withdrawn 27/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   27/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17579    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardrossan (30C)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57579    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
28/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
27/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57579    

prev prev