Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 842   04/1900
LMS 17580   01/01/1923
BR 57580   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 04/1900
Withdrawal Mon 20/11/1961
Scrapping During 02/1963
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30A Corkerhill 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67C Ayr 4w/e 06/07/1957
   Withdrawn 20/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67C Ayr 4w/e 13/07/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   20/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17580    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57580    
06/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
20/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57580    

prev prev