Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 755 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6360 Week
» 17907 Month
» 417589 Year
» 494176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 843   04/1900
LMS 17581   01/01/1923
BR 57581   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 04/1900
Withdrawal During 11/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Arnott Young (Troon)
Service Life 63 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27A Polmadie 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67D Ardrossan 4w/e 05/10/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66E Carstairs 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   07/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17581    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57581    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 57581    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev