Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 168 Today
» 1071 Yesterday
» 168 Week
» 19632 Month
» 419314 Year
» 495901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 845   04/1900
LMS 17583   01/01/1923
BR 57583   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
To Service During 04/1900
Withdrawal Mon 27/11/1961
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
28C Carstairs 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 27/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   27/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17583    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carstairs (28C)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57583    
27/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57583    

prev prev