Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 493 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5094 Week
» 16641 Month
» 416323 Year
» 492910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 864   04/1900
LMS 17602   01/01/1923
BR 57602   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 04/1900
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 62 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12G Dumfries 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 31D Grangemouth w/e 05/04/1947
EXLOAN 12G Dumfries w/e 31/05/1947
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17602    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dumfries (12G)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57602    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57602    

prev prev