Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 865   04/1900
LMS 17603   01/01/1923
BR 57603   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 04/1900
Withdrawal Mon 26/03/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31D Grangemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
64C Dalry Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/12/1952
   Withdrawn 26/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64C Dalry Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 27/12/1952
WDN   w/e 26/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17603    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Grangemouth (31D)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57603    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C)    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
26/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57603    

prev prev