Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 231 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 231 Week
» 11778 Month
» 411460 Year
» 488047 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 867   05/1900
LMS 17605   01/01/1923
BR 57605   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 05/1900
Withdrawal During 05/1960
Scrapping During 08/1960
Service Life 60 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
60C Helmsdale 4w/e 21/11/1959
60A Inverness 4w/e 19/12/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 60C Helmsdale 4w/e 21/11/1959
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 19/12/1959
WDN   05/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17605    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57605    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Helmsdale (60C)    
19/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 57605    

prev prev