Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 283   09/1899
LMS 17618   01/01/1923
BR 57618   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 09/1899
Withdrawal Mon 26/03/1962
Scrapping During 03/1963 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 62 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
28C Carstairs 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 26/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 26/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17618    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carstairs (28C)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57618    
26/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57618    
03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev