Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 76 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4933 Week
» 16638 Month
» 348127 Year
» 424714 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 284   09/1899
LMS 17619   01/01/1923
BR 57619   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 09/1899
Withdrawal During 06/1961
Scrapping During 08/1961
Service Life 61 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
27A Polmadie 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 10/05/1958
66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/03/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 11/03/1961
WDN   27/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17619    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Polmadie (27A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57619    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D)    
11/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57619    

prev prev