Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 285   09/1899
LMS 17620   01/01/1923
BR 57620   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 09/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 11/06/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
32C Forres 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 04/07/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 11/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 04/07/1959
WDN   w/e 11/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17620    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Forres (32C)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57620    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
11/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57620    

prev prev