Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 493 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5094 Week
» 16641 Month
» 416323 Year
» 492910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 287   10/1899
LMS 17622   01/01/1923
BR 57622   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 10/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 16/07/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
32A Inverness 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
60D Wick 4w/e 25/11/1950
66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/05/1951
66A Polmadie 4w/e 17/05/1952
60A Inverness 4w/e 29/11/1952
66A Polmadie 4w/e 16/05/1953
60A Inverness 4w/e 20/02/1954
66A Polmadie 8w/e 17/04/1954
60A Inverness 4w/e 30/10/1954
66A Polmadie 8w/e 09/07/1955
60A Inverness 4w/e 29/10/1955
66A Polmadie 4w/e 17/03/1956
   Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 14/04/1950
ALLOC 60A Inverness 22/10/1950
ALLOC 60D Wick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 14/05/1955
ALLOC 60A Inverness 4w/e 29/10/1955
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 3w/e 17/03/1956
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   w/e 16/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17622    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Inverness (32A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57622    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wick (60D)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
17/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
30/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
09/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
29/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (60A)    
17/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
16/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57622    

prev prev