Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 168 Today
» 1071 Yesterday
» 168 Week
» 19632 Month
» 419314 Year
» 495901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 288   10/1899
LMS 17623   01/01/1923
BR 57623   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 10/1899
Withdrawal Mon 20/11/1961
Scrapping During 03/1963
Service Life 62 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12G Dumfries 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 20/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   20/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17623    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dumfries (12G)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57623    
20/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 57623    

prev prev