Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 222 Today
» 1225 Yesterday
» 222 Week
» 11769 Month
» 411451 Year
» 488038 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 290   10/1899
LMS 17625   01/01/1923
BR 57625   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 10/1899
Withdrawal During 06/1963
Scrapping During 10/1963
Service Life 63 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
32A Inverness 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
60B Aviemore 4w/e 25/11/1950
66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/05/1951
66A Polmadie 4w/e 17/05/1952
60B Aviemore 4w/e 30/10/1954
66A Polmadie 8w/e 09/07/1955
60B Aviemore 4w/e 29/10/1955
66A Polmadie 4w/e 17/03/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 13/04/1950
ALLOC 60B Aviemore m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 19/05/1951
ALLOC 60B Aviemore 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 60B Aviemore 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 16/04/1955
ALLOC 60B Aviemore 4w/e 29/10/1955
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 3w/e 17/03/1956
WDN   01/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17625    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Inverness (32A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57625    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aviemore (60B)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
30/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aviemore (60B)    
09/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
29/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Aviemore (60B)    
17/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 57625    

prev prev