Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 291   10/1899
LMS 17626   01/01/1923
BR 57626   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 10/1899
Withdrawal w/e Mon 05/03/1962
Scrapping During 11/1962
Service Life 62 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
12A Carlisle Kingmoor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 05/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 27/04/1946
LOAN 31D Grangemouth w/e 05/04/1947
EXLOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 31/05/1947
WDN   w/e 05/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17626    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57626    
05/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 57626    

prev prev