Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 14 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6229 Week
» 17934 Month
» 349423 Year
» 426010 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 292   11/1899
LMS 17627   01/01/1923
BR 57627 w/e 09/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer McIntosh
Class 3F
Company History CR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder St. Rollox Works
To Service During 11/1899
Withdrawal During 11/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Arnott Young (Troon)
Service Life 64 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
30C Ardrossan 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   07/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1899 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17627    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardrossan (30C)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57627    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 57627    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Troon    

prev prev