Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 86 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4327 Week
» 17360 Month
» 239761 Year
» 1124142 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 139 m/e 02/1900
LMS 17698   01/01/1923
BR 57698   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer P. Drummond
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 02/1900
Withdrawal Thu 06/12/1951
Service Life 51 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn 06/12/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67B Hurlford m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   06/12/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17698    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Corkerhill (30A)    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57698    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hurlford (67B)    
12/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 57698    

prev prev