Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 212 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1311 Week
» 7445 Month
» 235329 Year
» 1456894 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 139 m/e 02/1900
LMS 17698   01/01/1923
BR 57698   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer P. Drummond
Class 3F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Dübs & Co
To Service During 02/1900
Withdrawal Thu 06/12/1951
Service Life 51 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1900
   Withdrawn 06/12/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 67B Hurlford m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   06/12/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/05/1947 Corkerhill MPD Six of the ex H. Rly. 'Barneys,' viz., Nos. 17694, 17695, 17697, 17698, 17699 and 17702, were seen on shed here on 25/5. Nos. 17695 and 17699 still have the safety valves on the dome, while No. 17697 has a stovepipe chimney. SLS/194708
03/12/1948 St. Rollox Works No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon was despatched on 19/11, still retaining L.M.S. on the tender (No. 2689), after having received attention to the boiler. Another interesting engine ex Works during the same week was 'Clan' goods, No. 57955. Both engines had been fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 15053 is still in the dump, while the boiler is undergoing repair. The inner firebox is being almost renewed by getting new tube and door plates, and new half sides. The engine is soon to enter the shops for a general repair. A further ex H.R. engine to come in for service repair was No. 17698 (30A), which arrived on 4/11 and was despatched on 25/11. No. 5716 is still in the shops, having been brought in from the dump on 12/10. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined are:-Nos. 55145 an 55231. SLS/194901
30/06/1949 Highland Section The few ex H.R.locomotives, now less than twenty, are not nowadays (apart from the 'Barney's' at Corkerhill) often seen south of Inverness or Forres. The one remaining 'Clan,' No. 54767 Clan Mackinnon, and the surviving 'Clan goods' put in most of their time on freight work on the 'Far North' road. Forres has the last 'Loch,' No. 14385, and a small 'Ben,' No. 14410. Another of the latter, No. 14409, does pilot work and odd jobs at Helmsdale, whilst the remaining three, Nos. 14398, 14399 an 54404, are at Wick and Thurso. The two small 0-4-4T's, Nos. 55051 an 55053, have both recently been repainted, with 'British Railways' on the tank sides. These work a week at a time on the Dornoch branch, the 'spare' engine being found at Helmsdale. 'Clan goods' No. 57955 has also been repainted. with 'British Railways' on the tender sides, as also have the 'Barney's,' Nos. 57695 an 57698, but the other renumbered locomotives, Nos. 54404, 54767, 57954 an 57956, are still lettered 'L.M.S.' Local traffic around Inverness is now handled by ex C.R. 4-4-0's, of which Nos. 14439, 54455/63/66/70/71, 14472, 54473/80/81, 14482, 54484, 14487, 54488/91, 14493/95 an 54496 are allocated to Inverness, Forres, Dingwall, etc. No. 54471 was noted at Dingwall, while No. 14472 was working the Black Isle branch train. Dunrobin has been sold, and it is understood to be destined for New Romney, Kent, although for what purpose is not known. SLS/194908

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1900 To Service      
01/01/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 17698    
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 57698    
06/12/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 57698    

prev prev