Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 581 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2696 Week
» 25202 Month
» 328392 Year
» 1549957 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2112 m/e 06/1923
British Railways 41930 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 06/1923
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/08/1952
Scrapping During y/e 1952
Service Life 29 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1923
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury 4w/e 21/07/1951
33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 23/08/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
WDN   w/e 23/08/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1923 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2112
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41930    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
23/08/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 41930    

prev prev