Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4282 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17688 Week
» 70704 Month
» 190231 Year
» 3217084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7110 |
23/01/1942 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12023 |
29/05/1948 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,822.00 |
To Service |
23/01/1942 |
Withdrawn |
23/12/1967 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs , 11 mths |
Cut Up |
07/1968 |
Cut At |
W Hatton Ltd (at Bolton MPD) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/01/1942 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/01/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7110 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
22/01/1944 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12023 |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
23/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12023 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by W Hatton Ltd: at Bolton MPD |
|
|