Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 157 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5911 Week
» 33869 Month
» 68511 Year
» 1290076 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2127 m/e 06/1927
BR 41945 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 06/1927
Withdrawal Mon 16/02/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33B Tilbury 4w/e 21/07/1951
33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 16/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   16/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1927 To Service To service as LMS Number 2127
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41945    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41945    

prev prev