Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 183 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5937 Week
» 33895 Month
» 68537 Year
» 1290102 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2128 m/e 06/1927
BR 41946 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 06/1927
Withdrawal Tue 17/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13C Tilbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33A Plaistow 4w/e 15/12/1956
   Withdrawn 17/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   17/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1927 To Service To service as LMS Number 2128
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tilbury (13C)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41946    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41946    
02/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev