Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 30 Online
» 717 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 9056 Week
» 6164 Month
» 113110 Year
» 1334675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2131 m/e 06/1927
BR 41949 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 06/1927
Withdrawal Thu 07/04/1960
Scrapping During 04/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33B Tilbury 4w/e 20/10/1951
30A Stratford 4w/e 23/01/1954
30E Colchester 4w/e 18/02/1956
30A Stratford 4w/e 15/06/1957
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 08/03/1958
31C Kings Lynn w/e 01/08/1959
31B March w/e 15/08/1959
31F Spital Bridge w/e 24/10/1959
31B March w/e 06/02/1960
   Withdrawn 07/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 31F   4w/e 28/03/1958
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 31F Spital Bridge 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   07/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1927 To Service To service as LMS Number 2131
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41949    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
15/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (31F)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 41949    

prev prev