Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 157 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5911 Week
» 33869 Month
» 68511 Year
» 1290076 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2132 m/e 07/1927
BR 41950 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 07/1927
Withdrawal Tue 17/02/1959
Scrapping During 02/1960 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 31 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13C Tilbury 4w/e 22/06/1946
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
33A Plaistow 4w/e 23/01/1954
   Withdrawn 17/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954
WDN   17/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1927 To Service To service as LMS Number 2132
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (13C)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41950    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 41950    
02/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev