Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 131 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4643 Week
» 27149 Month
» 330339 Year
» 1551904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2133 m/e 07/1927
British Railways 41951 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 07/1927
Withdrawal Wed 19/12/1956
Scrapping During y/e 1957
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1927
13C Tilbury 4w/e 22/06/1946
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury 4w/e 21/07/1951
33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
30A Stratford 4w/e 20/02/1954
   Withdrawn on 19/12/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/02/1954
WDN   on 19/12/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1949 Devons Road MPD Engines stored here are Nos. 2097, 41923/41, 41951 (with 2133 numberplate), 41968/76, 2100/07/21. No. 43828, just off Bow Works, was painted plain black without lettering on the tender. SLS/194909
25/03/1950 Devons Road MPD In the Works' roads were: Nos. 40532 (ex Works), 43607, 44370, also Nos. 41939/51 (lined out and ? stored), 41928/29/41/45/66/68/76/77 an 2097. The crane tank-No. 58865-was in the shed and four 0-6-OT's were in evidence: Nos. M27510, 58853/58/61. SLS/195005

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2133
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (13C)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41951    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
20/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/12/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 41951    

prev prev