Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 890 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 3005 Week
» 25511 Month
» 328701 Year
» 1550266 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2134 m/e 07/1927
British Railways 41952 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 07/1927
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1956
Scrapping During y/e 1957
Service Life 29 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1927
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
30A Stratford 4w/e 19/12/1953
   Withdrawn on 29/12/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/11/1953
WDN   on 29/12/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2134
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 41952    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
29/12/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 41952    

prev prev