Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 797 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2912 Week
» 25418 Month
» 328608 Year
» 1550173 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2135 m/e 03/1897
British Railways 41953 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 03/1897
Withdrawal Sat 25/08/1951
Scrapping During 09/1951
Service Life 54 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1897
13C Tilbury on 01/01/1948
33A Plaistow 4w/e 21/07/1951
   Withdrawn on 25/08/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33A Plaistow w/e 07/07/1951
WDN   on 25/08/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1897 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2135
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tilbury (13C)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41953    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
25/08/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 41953    

prev prev