Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 504 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6258 Week
» 34216 Month
» 68858 Year
» 1290423 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2141 m/e 12/1898
BR 41959 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 12/1898
Withdrawal Fri 28/09/1951
Scrapping During y/e 1951
Service Life 52 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 21/07/1951
   Withdrawn 28/09/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33C Shoeburyness w/e 07/07/1951
WDN   28/09/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1898 To Service To service as LMS Number 2141    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41959    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
09/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 41959    

prev prev