Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1869 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15275 Week
» 68291 Month
» 187818 Year
» 3214671 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7113 |
14/02/1942 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12026 |
30/10/1948 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,822.00 |
To Service |
14/02/1942 |
Withdrawn |
21/10/1967 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
Cut Up |
02/04/1968 |
Cut At |
Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/02/1942 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/02/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7113 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12026 |
|
|
09/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
02/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
06/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
21/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12026 |
|
|
02/04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles |
|
|