Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 543 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2658 Week
» 25164 Month
» 328354 Year
» 1549919 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2151 m/e 01/1930
British Railways 41969 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 01/1930
Withdrawal Thu 07/04/1960
Scrapping During 04/1960
Service Life 30 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1930
13A Plaistow 4w/e 22/06/1946
13A Plaistow on 01/01/1948
33B Tilbury 4w/e 21/07/1951
33A Plaistow 4w/e 23/01/1954
33C Shoeburyness 4w/e 15/12/1956
33A Plaistow 5w/e 15/11/1958
31F Spital Bridge w/e 31/01/1959
31C Kings Lynn w/e 01/08/1959
31B March w/e 15/08/1959
   Withdrawn on 07/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1954
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 31F Spital Bridge 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   on 07/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/10/1958 E.R. locomotive news C12 67352 is now acting as Station pilot, Grantham and is ex-works, fully lined out; J52 68846 is ex-works, fully lined out at Hornsey; L.T.S.R. 4-4-2T 41969 is ex-works in unlined black at Plaistow; 61632, Belvoir Castle has been renamed Royal Sovereign and was ex-Stratford mid-October whilst 61671 was still in scrap yard with nameplates Royal Sovereign. SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1930 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2151
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (13A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41969    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Shoeburyness (33C)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (31F)    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 41969    

prev prev