Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 164 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5918 Week
» 33876 Month
» 68518 Year
» 1290083 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2156 m/e 02/1930
BR 41974 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Whitelegg
Class Tilbury Tanks
Company History LTSR/LMS
Wheels 4-4-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 02/1930
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/02/1955
Scrapping During 02/1955
Service Life 25 yrs , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
13A Plaistow 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 29C Dundee West w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC 29C Dundee West w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 20F Skipton w/e 19/06/1948
WDN   w/e 12/02/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1930 To Service To service as LMS Number 2156
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Plaistow (13A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 41974    
02/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 41974    

prev prev