Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 310 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18113 Week
» 71129 Month
» 190656 Year
» 3217509 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7116 |
03/1942 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12029 |
08/09/1951 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/7 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£8,822.00 |
To Service |
03/1942 |
Withdrawn |
21/05/1966 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
Cut Up |
07/1966 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Derby) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/1942 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7116 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12029 |
|
|
29/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
21/05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12029 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|