Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17173 Week
» 70189 Month
» 189716 Year
» 3216569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7117 |
28/03/1942 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12030 |
01/01/1949 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/03/1942 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7117 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
01/01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12030 |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
08/08/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12030 |
|
|
09/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|