Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 301 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5270 Week
» 17783 Month
» 105975 Year
» 990356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
  7121 31/05/1945
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12034 25/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 31/05/1945
Withdrawn 19/10/1968
Time in Service 23 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 09/1969
Cut At J McWilliams (Shettleston)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1A Willesden 4w/e 06/11/1954
21A Saltley 4w/e 10/08/1957
17A Derby 4w/e 09/08/1958
8C Speke Junction w/e 10/12/1966
10D Lostock Hall w/e 20/05/1967
8C Speke Junction w/e 06/01/1968
8J Allerton w/e 11/05/1968
   Withdrawn 19/10/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/05/1945 To Service To service as 12034
Built at Derby Works
   
31/05/1945 To Service To service as 7121
Built at Derby Works
   
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
19/10/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 12034    
19/10/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 7121    
17/07/1969 Sightings Glasgow Works visit: In Works RO 9/1969 Link
03/08/1969 Sightings Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works RO 10/1969 Link
09/1969 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    
01/09/1969 Sightings Eastfield Triangle: Dumped on Eastfield triangle. RO 9/1969 Link
03/09/1969 Sightings Departed Eastfield for McWilliams, Shettleston RO 11/1969  

prev prev