Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3114 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17157 Week
» 82111 Month
» 284775 Year
» 3311628 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7123 |
09/08/1945 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12036 |
14/05/1949 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/08/1945 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/08/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway number D7123 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12036 |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
22/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12036 |
|
|
03/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|