Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 4012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17418 Week
» 70434 Month
» 189961 Year
» 3216814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
7125 |
05/12/1945 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12038 |
21/04/1951 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£11,425.00 |
To Service |
05/12/1945 |
Withdrawn |
25/01/1969 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1971 |
Cut At |
Cohens (Kettering) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/12/1945 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/12/1945 |
To Service |
|
|
|
30/11/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12038 |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
16/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12038 |
|
|
05/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|