Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 155 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19066 Week
» 84020 Month
» 286684 Year
» 3313537 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2193 |
m/e |
09/1901 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Unclassified |
Company History |
BPGVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Chapman & Furneaux |
To Service |
During 09/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 26/02/1952 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1901 |
LLY |
|
Llanelli |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/02/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
29/02/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/11/1959 |
Brecon demotion |
Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2193 Built at Chapman & Furneaux |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Llanelli (LLY) |
|
|
26/02/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2193 |
|
|